U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30131-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Frost
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [Transcript]
June, 2017
  • June 13, 2017: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • June 02, 2017: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Acquittal]
  • May 25, 2017: [Acquittal]
  • May 25, 2017: [Judgment of Acquittal]
  • May 25, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • May 25, 2017: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • May 25, 2017: [Verdict]
  • May 25, 2017: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • May 25, 2017: [Jury Instructions]
  • May 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 24, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • May 24, 2017: [Jury Instructions]
  • May 23, 2017: [Jury List]
  • May 23, 2017: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • May 22, 2017: [In Limine]
  • May 22, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 19, 2017: [Supplement]
  • May 19, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 19, 2017: [For Order]
  • May 19, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • May 19, 2017: [Witness List]
  • May 16, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • May 12, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 12, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • May 10, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • May 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 09, 2017: [Order]
  • May 09, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 08, 2017: [Witness List]
April, 2017
  • April 30, 2017: [Continue]
  • April 28, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • April 28, 2017: [In Limine]
  • April 28, 2017: [Witness List]
  • April 26, 2017: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 25, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • April 25, 2017: [In Limine]
  • April 24, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • April 20, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 14, 2017: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • April 13, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
  • April 12, 2017: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • April 12, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 20, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 20, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2017
  • January 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 23, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 23, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2016
  • December 14, 2016: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 14, 2016: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • December 07, 2016: [Order]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 28, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 28, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [Order]
  • October 25, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • October 24, 2016: [Request]
  • October 17, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 17, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • October 17, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 17, 2016: [Request]
  • October 17, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 17, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 17, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 17, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 17, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 17, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • October 17, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 14, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 14, 2016: [Arrest]
  • October 14, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • October 14, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 14, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 14, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 13, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 13, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.