U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30130-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bear Stops et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 05, 2020: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
October, 2019
  • October 08, 2019: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 26, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • August 26, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 12, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 12, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 12, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 06, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 06, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • July 10, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 02, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • June 28, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • June 28, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 28, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • June 28, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • June 19, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 17, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • June 14, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 14, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 14, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 14, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 14, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • June 11, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 26, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 26, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 18, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • March 06, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 22, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 08, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 05, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2019
  • January 18, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 16, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 16, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • January 16, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 16, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 16, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • January 16, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 16, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 14, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Judgment Returned Executed]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 31, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 15, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 15, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 04, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
September, 2018
  • September 18, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 13, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • September 12, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • September 12, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • September 12, 2018: [Order]
  • September 12, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 12, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 12, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 31, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 30, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 30, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 30, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 30, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 30, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
July, 2018
  • July 11, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
June, 2018
  • June 13, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 13, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 13, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 11, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
April, 2018
  • April 24, 2018: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • April 18, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 16, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 16, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • April 16, 2018: [Order]
  • April 16, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • April 16, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 28, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • March 28, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • March 28, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 28, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
December, 2017
  • December 14, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 01, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 01, 2017: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
  • December 01, 2017: [Sealed Supporting Document(s)]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 14, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 14, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 14, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 08, 2017: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 08, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
October, 2017
  • October 25, 2017: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 13, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 13, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 10, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • October 05, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 04, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 04, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • October 04, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • October 04, 2017: [Order]
  • October 03, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 03, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • October 03, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • September 26, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 26, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 26, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 26, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 26, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • September 25, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 25, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • September 18, 2017: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
August, 2017
  • August 17, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 11, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • August 11, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 10, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • August 10, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • August 10, 2017: [Order]
  • August 10, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 10, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 10, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 10, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 10, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • August 09, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 09, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • May 02, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
April, 2017
  • April 19, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 19, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 18, 2017: [Sentencing]
March, 2017
  • March 09, 2017: [Judgment - Amended]
  • March 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 06, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 02, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 01, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 01, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 28, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 28, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • February 27, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • February 15, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 15, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 10, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 10, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 09, 2017: [Release from Custody]
  • February 07, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 03, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • January 24, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2016
  • December 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • December 15, 2016: [Furlough]
  • December 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • December 15, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • December 13, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 13, 2016: [Furlough]
  • December 12, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 07, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 07, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • December 07, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 06, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 06, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 02, 2016: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 02, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 02, 2016: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 02, 2016: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 02, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 01, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 29, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 29, 2016: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 29, 2016: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 29, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 28, 2016: [Order]
  • November 09, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • November 09, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • November 09, 2016: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • November 04, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 03, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 02, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • November 02, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • November 01, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
  • November 01, 2016: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • November 01, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • November 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • November 01, 2016: [Quash]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 28, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 26, 2016: [Order]
  • October 26, 2016: [Request]
  • October 25, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • October 24, 2016: [Order]
  • October 20, 2016: [Request]
  • October 20, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • October 18, 2016: [Request]
  • October 18, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • October 17, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • October 17, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 17, 2016: [Request]
  • October 17, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 17, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • October 17, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 17, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 17, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 17, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 17, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 14, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • October 14, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 14, 2016: [Arrest]
  • October 14, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 14, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 14, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 13, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 13, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.