U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30129-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Condon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 29, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 10, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • September 30, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • September 29, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • September 29, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • September 29, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 28, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • September 15, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 14, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 14, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • September 14, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2019
  • October 09, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 08, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 27, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 13, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • September 13, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 05, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 26, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 22, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • August 22, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • August 22, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 22, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 22, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • August 22, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
July, 2019
  • July 15, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 12, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 12, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 12, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 12, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 12, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
March, 2017
  • March 08, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 08, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 08, 2017: [Sentencing]
February, 2017
  • February 22, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • February 21, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 21, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 08, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2016
  • December 13, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 13, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 12, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 09, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 09, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 09, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 09, 2016: [Extend]
November, 2016
  • November 16, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 16, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • November 16, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 09, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • November 09, 2016: [Indictment - Superseding]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [Order]
  • October 25, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • October 24, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • October 21, 2016: [Request]
  • October 17, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 17, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 17, 2016: [Request]
  • October 17, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 17, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 17, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • October 17, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • October 17, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • October 17, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 17, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 17, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • October 17, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 17, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 17, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 17, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • October 14, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 14, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 14, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 14, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 13, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 13, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.