U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-10038-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Plenty Chief
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • June 30, 2022: [Transcript]
  • June 10, 2022: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • June 09, 2022: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • June 09, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • June 08, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 06, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 06, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 06, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 04, 2022: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 09, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 03, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 03, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • March 03, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • February 23, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • February 17, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 17, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
May, 2021
  • May 11, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 10, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 10, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 21, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 14, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • December 11, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 07, 2020: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
November, 2020
  • November 03, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 02, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • November 02, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • November 02, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Oral Scheduling Order]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 24, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 21, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • August 21, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 21, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 21, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 20, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
July, 2019
  • July 02, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 02, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 02, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 26, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 03, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • May 22, 2019: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • May 03, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • May 01, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • April 30, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 30, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 30, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 30, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 30, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • April 25, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • April 25, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • April 24, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2017
  • June 01, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 01, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Sentencing]
March, 2017
  • March 24, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 24, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 10, 2017: [Sealed Supporting Document(s)]
  • March 10, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 08, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
  • March 06, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2017
  • January 06, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 06, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 06, 2017: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • January 03, 2017: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
December, 2016
  • December 23, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 22, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 22, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 22, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2016
  • November 23, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • November 17, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • November 14, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 14, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 14, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • November 10, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 10, 2016: [Arrest]
  • November 07, 2016: [Order]
  • November 07, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 07, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 04, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 04, 2016: [Consent]
  • November 04, 2016: [Continue]
  • November 04, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 04, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 04, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 04, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • November 04, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • November 04, 2016: [Request]
October, 2016
  • October 13, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 13, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.