U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30142-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Parker
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 01, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Probation]
October, 2018
  • October 19, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 03, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 03, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 02, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • October 02, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
September, 2018
  • September 11, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 11, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 11, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 21, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 23, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 11, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 10, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 10, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 10, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2018
  • May 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 03, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 03, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2018
  • April 06, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 05, 2018: [Request]
  • April 05, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 04, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 04, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 04, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 04, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 04, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • April 04, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 16, 2018: [Case Reopened]
  • March 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 09, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 07, 2018: [Notice]
March, 2017
  • March 07, 2017: [Order]
  • March 07, 2017: [Order to Exclude Period of Delay]
  • March 07, 2017: [Stipulation to Exclude Period of Delay]
  • March 07, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 07, 2017: [Agreement for Pretrial Diversion]
  • March 07, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 07, 2017: [Order for Pretrial Diversion]
February, 2017
  • February 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 06, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 06, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2016
  • December 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 06, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 06, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2016
  • November 16, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • November 16, 2016: [Order]
  • November 16, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 16, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 14, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 14, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 14, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 14, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 14, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • November 14, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 14, 2016: [Arrest]
  • November 11, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • November 11, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 10, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 10, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • November 10, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • November 10, 2016: [Request]
  • November 10, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 10, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2016
  • October 13, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 13, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.