U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-10036-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Svatos
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 01, 2019: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
January, 2018
  • January 09, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
October, 2017
  • October 20, 2017: [Judgment - Amended]
  • October 13, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 13, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 12, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • October 12, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • October 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • October 11, 2017: [Proposed Order]
  • October 11, 2017: [Forfeiture]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 15, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 15, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 15, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 01, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
August, 2017
  • August 18, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2017
  • July 05, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 05, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
June, 2017
  • June 20, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 16, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 16, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 16, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2017
  • May 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 19, 2017: [Consent]
  • May 19, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • May 19, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2016
  • December 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 01, 2016: [Consent]
  • December 01, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 01, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • December 01, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Order]
  • October 21, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • October 17, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 14, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 14, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • October 14, 2016: [Arrest]
  • October 14, 2016: [Request]
  • October 13, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • October 13, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 13, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
  • October 12, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • October 12, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 12, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 12, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • October 12, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.