U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-01047
  • Case Name: DuMarce v. Nikolas et. al.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 14, 2020: [Filing Fee Received]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Receipt of Initial Partial Filing Fee]
June, 2017
  • June 02, 2017: [Judgment of Dismissal (Clerk)]
  • June 02, 2017: [Order]
May, 2017
  • May 17, 2017: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
April, 2017
  • April 21, 2017: [Order]
October, 2016
  • October 20, 2016: [Letter Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.