U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50128-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gay
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
  • July 07, 2020: [Mail Returned]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • June 25, 2020: [Response]
  • June 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 15, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • June 15, 2020: [Extend]
  • June 11, 2020: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
May, 2020
  • May 04, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
August, 2017
  • August 17, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
June, 2017
  • June 22, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 22, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 21, 2017: [Sentencing]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 22, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 22, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 22, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 21, 2017: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • April 21, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • April 17, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 09, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 03, 2017: [Consent]
  • March 03, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 03, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 27, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 27, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 27, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2017
  • January 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 09, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 09, 2017: [Continue]
November, 2016
  • November 16, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • November 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 08, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 04, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
October, 2016
  • October 21, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 21, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • October 21, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • October 21, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 21, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 21, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • October 21, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 21, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • October 21, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 21, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
  • October 20, 2016: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.