U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50136-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lasthorse
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: [Consent]
  • April 10, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 10, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 20, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 10, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 03, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 03, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 02, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • March 02, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 02, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 02, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 02, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 28, 2020: [Request for Warrant]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
October, 2019
  • October 15, 2019: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 22, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 15, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 09, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 08, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • July 02, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 25, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • June 25, 2019: [Consent]
  • June 25, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 25, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 25, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 25, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
December, 2018
  • December 04, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 03, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 14, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 26, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 26, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 26, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 26, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 26, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 26, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 26, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 25, 2018: [Warrant Issued on Revocation]
  • October 25, 2018: [Order for Warrant - Probation Request]
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 17, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 08, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
April, 2018
  • April 03, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 02, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • March 30, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 30, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 30, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 30, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 28, 2018: [Warrant Issued on Revocation]
December, 2017
  • December 05, 2017: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 05, 2017: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2017
  • June 20, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 14, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • June 14, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 18, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • March 22, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • March 22, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 22, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 20, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 20, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • March 20, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 20, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 20, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 20, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 17, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • March 17, 2017: [Warrant Issued on Revocation]
  • March 17, 2017: [Order for Warrant - Probation Request]
  • March 17, 2017: [Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 17, 2017: [Request for Warrant]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 18, 2017: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
November, 2016
  • November 14, 2016: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 03, 2016: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2016
  • October 21, 2016: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.