U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:11-cr-40099-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Johnson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 26, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 14, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
June, 2019
  • June 04, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 04, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • June 04, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 04, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 03, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 03, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 03, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 03, 2019: [Consent]
  • June 03, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
April, 2019
  • April 12, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 05, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 21, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 21, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 21, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • March 20, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 20, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 20, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • March 20, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 20, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 20, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
December, 2017
  • December 15, 2017: [Judgment Returned Executed]
November, 2017
  • November 06, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 06, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 06, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 01, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
October, 2017
  • October 19, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 19, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 18, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 18, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • October 18, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 18, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 18, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 18, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • October 18, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
June, 2017
  • June 21, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 19, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 16, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 14, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 05, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 05, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 05, 2017: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • June 02, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 02, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 02, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 02, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 02, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 02, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • June 02, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 02, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • June 01, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 01, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 30, 2017: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 25, 2016: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.