U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50129-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stadnick et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 11, 2022: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order on Petition to Revoke]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order on Request to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 01, 2021: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2017
  • September 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
June, 2017
  • June 16, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • June 05, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 05, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 02, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
  • June 02, 2017: [Sentencing]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • May 24, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 22, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 22, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 22, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 17, 2017: [Order Referring Motion]
  • May 17, 2017: [Furlough]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 21, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 06, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 14, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
February, 2017
  • February 17, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 17, 2017: [Consent]
  • February 17, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 14, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines]
  • February 14, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 14, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 14, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 14, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2017
  • January 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 20, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 20, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • December 29, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 22, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 22, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 22, 2016: [Release from Custody]
November, 2016
  • November 17, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • November 05, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • October 28, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • October 28, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 28, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 28, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 28, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 28, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • October 27, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • October 27, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 27, 2016: [Arrest]
  • October 27, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.