U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40117-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Callejas Velasco
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2017
  • January 24, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 24, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 24, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 24, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • January 17, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
December, 2016
  • December 07, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 07, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 07, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 07, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2016
  • November 14, 2016: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • November 02, 2016: [Response]
  • November 01, 2016: [Oral Order]
  • November 01, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • November 01, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.