U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40118-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Coker
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • April 27, 2017: [Forfeiture]
  • April 24, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 24, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 24, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • April 24, 2017: [Declaration of Publication]
  • April 17, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 17, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 17, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 21, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2017
  • January 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • January 24, 2017: [Forfeiture]
  • January 24, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 23, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 23, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 18, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 17, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 17, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 17, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 10, 2017: [Continue]
December, 2016
  • December 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Discovery]
  • November 15, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 15, 2016: [Request]
  • November 14, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 14, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • November 14, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • November 14, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • November 14, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 14, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • November 14, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 14, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 14, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • November 08, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 02, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 02, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 01, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 01, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • November 01, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.