U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40116-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mercado-Sanchez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 30, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 30, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 30, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • January 23, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 10, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 05, 2017: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • January 04, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
December, 2016
  • December 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 22, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 13, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • November 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • November 22, 2016: [Release from Custody]
  • November 22, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 22, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • November 22, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 14, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 02, 2016: [Response]
  • November 01, 2016: [Oral Order]
  • November 01, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • November 01, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.