U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40072-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Smith
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 28, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 20, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 12, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • December 12, 2022: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • December 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 08, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 08, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 08, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 08, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • December 07, 2022: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 06, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 28, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 16, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 14, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 10, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 08, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 04, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 04, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 04, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • March 04, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 03, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 23, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 16, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 13, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 10, 2021: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • August 10, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 10, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 10, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 10, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 10, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 10, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • August 09, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 06, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
December, 2017
  • December 11, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 11, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 11, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • December 10, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 07, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • December 04, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 01, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 01, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 01, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 30, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 22, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • November 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 14, 2017: [Continue]
  • November 08, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • November 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 03, 2017: [Continue]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 30, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 27, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 27, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 27, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 17, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 03, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2017
  • August 17, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • August 16, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 16, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 15, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 15, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 15, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 14, 2017: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
July, 2017
  • July 07, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 27, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • June 27, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2017
  • May 15, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 26, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2017
  • March 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • March 03, 2017: [Discovery]
February, 2017
  • February 02, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 24, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 13, 2017: [Response]
  • January 10, 2017: [Request]
  • January 10, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 06, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • January 06, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • January 06, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 05, 2017: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • January 05, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 05, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 05, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 05, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • January 04, 2017: [Bail Report]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 20, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 20, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
November, 2016
  • November 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
  • November 01, 2016: [Dismiss Count]
  • November 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • November 01, 2016: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.