U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-10043-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hofer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
August, 2019
  • August 06, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • August 06, 2019: [Transcript - Restricted]
December, 2017
  • December 15, 2017: [Judgment Returned Executed]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 31, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 31, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • October 31, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • October 27, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 17, 2017: [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • October 13, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 13, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 13, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 11, 2017: [Memorandum Letter]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 29, 2017: [Brief]
  • September 29, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 26, 2017: [Memorandum Letter]
  • September 15, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • September 13, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • August 01, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 01, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
July, 2017
  • July 20, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 18, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 18, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 18, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 10, 2017: [Memorandum Letter]
May, 2017
  • May 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 16, 2017: [Consent]
  • May 16, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • May 16, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2016
  • December 16, 2016: [Order]
  • December 15, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • December 15, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 14, 2016: [Discovery]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 22, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 14, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 14, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 14, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • November 14, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 14, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • November 14, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 10, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • November 08, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 03, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 02, 2016: [Add Counts - Indictment]
  • November 02, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 02, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • November 01, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • November 01, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.