U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-10042-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thompson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 13, 2019: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • May 09, 2019: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • May 09, 2019: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
July, 2018
  • July 02, 2018: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Judgment - Amended]
  • May 23, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 23, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 22, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • May 18, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 18, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 18, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 04, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
April, 2017
  • April 21, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 21, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • March 16, 2017: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • March 16, 2017: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • March 16, 2017: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • March 16, 2017: [Verdict]
  • March 16, 2017: [Response to Jury Question]
  • March 16, 2017: [Jury Question]
  • March 16, 2017: [Jury Instructions]
  • March 16, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • March 16, 2017: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • March 15, 2017: [Jury List]
  • March 14, 2017: [Notice]
  • March 10, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • March 10, 2017: [In Limine]
  • March 10, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 10, 2017: [Trial Brief ]
  • March 10, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • March 10, 2017: [Witness List]
  • March 06, 2017: [Notice]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • February 28, 2017: [Notice]
  • February 27, 2017: [Notice]
  • February 27, 2017: [In Limine]
  • February 27, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • February 27, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 21, 2017: [Add and Terminate Judges]
December, 2016
  • December 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 15, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 15, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • December 15, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Order]
  • November 29, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • November 16, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 14, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 14, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 14, 2016: [Response]
  • November 14, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 14, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 14, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • November 14, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 14, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 14, 2016: [Arrest]
  • November 09, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • November 09, 2016: [Request]
  • November 09, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 01, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • November 01, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.