U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ghost
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 10, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
July, 2018
  • July 16, 2018: [USCA Judgment]
  • July 16, 2018: [USCA Opinion]
July, 2017
  • July 18, 2017: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • July 17, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 15, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • July 15, 2017: [Transcript - Public]
  • July 15, 2017: [Transcript - Restricted]
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • June 23, 2017: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • June 23, 2017: [Court Reporter Information]
  • June 23, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • June 13, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 13, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 13, 2017: [Sentencing]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • May 22, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 22, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 22, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 08, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 05, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 17, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 15, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 10, 2017: [Consent]
  • March 10, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 10, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 03, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 03, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 03, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 03, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2017
  • January 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 12, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 10, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • November 29, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 29, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 10, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 07, 2016: [Request]
  • November 07, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 07, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • November 04, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 04, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • November 04, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 04, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 04, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 04, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 04, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • November 02, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • November 02, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 02, 2016: [Arrest]
  • November 02, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.