U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50120-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bangsund
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • October 11, 2018: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 05, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2017
  • March 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 10, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2017
  • January 23, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 12, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • December 06, 2016: [Request]
  • December 06, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 02, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 02, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 02, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 02, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 02, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • December 02, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 01, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Consent]
  • November 29, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 28, 2016: [Consent]
  • November 14, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 07, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 04, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • November 04, 2016: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • November 03, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 03, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
  • November 03, 2016: [Arrest - Other District]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.