U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:09-cr-50084-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Old Horse
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • February 08, 2022: [Sentencing]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • January 18, 2022: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 13, 2022: [Evaluation]
  • January 12, 2022: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • January 12, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
August, 2021
  • August 13, 2021: [Text Scheduling Order]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 28, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • June 10, 2021: [Order for Presentence Study and Report]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 19, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 19, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Consent]
  • April 30, 2021: [Status Conference]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 25, 2021: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • March 23, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 23, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 18, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • February 17, 2021: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 19, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 19, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 19, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 08, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 18, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 12, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 16, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 08, 2020: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • October 07, 2020: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • October 07, 2020: [Evidentiary Hearing]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • September 08, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 04, 2020: [Consent]
  • September 04, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 04, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 04, 2020: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • September 03, 2020: [Request]
  • September 03, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 03, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 02, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 02, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • September 02, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 02, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 02, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 02, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • September 02, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • September 01, 2020: [Consent]
  • September 01, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 01, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 31, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 31, 2020: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 21, 2020: [Indictment]
December, 2016
  • December 05, 2016: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
November, 2016
  • November 04, 2016: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.