U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40119-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pickner
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 27, 2020: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
January, 2019
  • January 04, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 04, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
December, 2018
  • December 13, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 23, 2018: [Continue]
October, 2018
  • October 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 18, 2018: [Continue]
  • October 09, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 18, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 14, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 14, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 14, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • September 14, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 14, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 14, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • September 14, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
April, 2017
  • April 17, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • April 10, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 10, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 10, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • April 03, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 31, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 28, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 27, 2017: [Hearing ]
  • March 27, 2017: [Revoke]
  • March 23, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 23, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 21, 2017: [Hearing ]
  • March 21, 2017: [For Order]
  • March 21, 2017: [Revoke]
  • March 20, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 06, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2017
  • January 13, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 13, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 11, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 10, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 10, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 10, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • November 22, 2016: [Discovery]
  • November 15, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 14, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 14, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • November 14, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 14, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • November 14, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 14, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 14, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • November 14, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • November 09, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 09, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 08, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 04, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 04, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 04, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • November 03, 2016: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.