U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-04157
  • Case Name: Chavez-Cruz v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 07, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [USCA Order]
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: [USCA Judgment]
June, 2018
  • June 20, 2018: [USCA Order (Non-Electronic Record)]
  • June 20, 2018: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • June 18, 2018: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • June 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 15, 2018: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • June 15, 2018: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
  • June 15, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 15, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Judgment]
  • May 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • May 25, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • May 25, 2018: [Order on Objection to Report and Recommendation]
October, 2017
  • October 17, 2017: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • October 13, 2017: [Notice]
  • October 04, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • June 13, 2017: [Letter Sent]
  • June 13, 2017: [Reply to Motion Response]
May, 2017
  • May 19, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 19, 2017: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • May 19, 2017: [Response to Motion to Vacate (28:2255)]
April, 2017
  • April 19, 2017: [Certificate]
  • April 19, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • April 17, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
  • April 07, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
March, 2017
  • March 08, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
February, 2017
  • February 22, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Certificate]
  • January 30, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 30, 2017: [Notice]
  • January 13, 2017: [Certificate]
  • January 13, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • January 09, 2017: [Order]
  • January 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • January 06, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
December, 2016
  • December 07, 2016: [Certificate]
  • December 05, 2016: [Notice]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 18, 2016: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 18, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • November 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 16, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 16, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
  • November 16, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 15, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 07, 2016: [Letter Sent]
  • November 07, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 07, 2016: [Supplement]
  • November 07, 2016: [Order]
  • November 07, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (28:2255) (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.