U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:08-cr-50021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Poor Bear
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 11, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 10, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 09, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 09, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • October 05, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 04, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
June, 2018
  • June 13, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 08, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 08, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 08, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 08, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 08, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 08, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • June 06, 2018: [Furlough]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 30, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
January, 2017
  • January 12, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 11, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 05, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
December, 2016
  • December 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • December 02, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 01, 2016: [Text Scheduling Order]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • November 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • November 17, 2016: [Furlough]
  • November 10, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 09, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • November 09, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • November 09, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 09, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 09, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 09, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 09, 2016: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • November 09, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 09, 2016: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • November 08, 2016: [Warrant Issued on Revocation]
  • November 08, 2016: [Order for Warrant - Probation Request]
  • November 08, 2016: [Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 08, 2016: [Request for Warrant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.