U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40125-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bryant
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Compel]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 05, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 01, 2022: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 09, 2022: [Supplement]
  • June 06, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order re Exhibits]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Supplement]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Discovery]
  • March 23, 2022: [Response]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • February 16, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • February 04, 2022: [Supplement]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 25, 2022: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 10, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Supplement]
  • October 18, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Return of Property]
  • September 27, 2021: [Response]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 16, 2021: [Return of Property]
  • July 02, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • May 04, 2021: [USCA Judgment]
  • May 03, 2021: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • May 03, 2021: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • April 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
  • April 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • April 02, 2021: [Supplement]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Notice]
  • March 15, 2021: [Letter]
  • March 05, 2021: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • March 01, 2021: [Supplement]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 25, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • October 26, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • October 16, 2020: [Discovery]
  • October 13, 2020: [Letter]
  • October 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
  • October 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 09, 2020: [Letter]
  • October 06, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information - Probation]
  • October 06, 2020: [Receipt]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Letter]
  • September 21, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 14, 2020: [Letter]
  • September 08, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 08, 2020: [Supplement]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • August 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 10, 2020: [Extend]
  • August 07, 2020: [Supplement]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 28, 2020: [Extend]
  • July 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 22, 2020: [Extend]
  • July 15, 2020: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
  • July 10, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
April, 2020
  • April 21, 2020: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
November, 2019
  • November 12, 2019: [Request]
October, 2019
  • October 15, 2019: [Request]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Request]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • August 09, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 07, 2019: [Discovery]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • July 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Compel]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Response]
  • June 14, 2019: [Notice]
  • June 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 10, 2019: [Extend]
  • June 04, 2019: [Text Order]
May, 2019
  • May 09, 2019: [Compel ]
  • May 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Produce]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [Letter]
  • April 12, 2019: [Produce ]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 05, 2019: [Discovery]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Appeal Record Returned]
  • February 12, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: [USCA Judgment]
  • January 22, 2019: [USCA Opinion]
October, 2018
  • October 09, 2018: [Response]
  • October 09, 2018: [Letter]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 10, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 04, 2018: [Reply to Motion Response]
August, 2018
  • August 03, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • August 01, 2018: [Order]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Letter]
  • July 13, 2018: [Discovery]
June, 2018
  • June 12, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2017
  • December 11, 2017: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • December 11, 2017: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • December 08, 2017: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • December 08, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • December 08, 2017: [Transcript - Public]
  • December 07, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • December 07, 2017: [Transcript - Public]
  • December 07, 2017: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • December 07, 2017: [Transcript]
  • December 04, 2017: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • December 04, 2017: [Judgment - Amended]
  • December 04, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
November, 2017
  • November 24, 2017: [Allocution Statement]
  • November 22, 2017: [Letter]
  • November 22, 2017: [Allocution Statement]
  • November 21, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 17, 2017: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • November 16, 2017: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • November 16, 2017: [Court Reporter Information]
  • November 16, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • November 16, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 15, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • November 15, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 15, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 14, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • November 14, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • November 13, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 12, 2017: [Sealed Supporting Document(s)]
  • November 09, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • November 08, 2017: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 07, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 06, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 06, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 06, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Allocution Statement]
  • October 23, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • October 23, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 20, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • October 20, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 29, 2017: [Continue]
  • September 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • September 28, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • September 28, 2017: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 18, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2017
  • August 01, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 01, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 31, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 31, 2017: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • July 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 19, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 19, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • July 18, 2017: [Continue]
  • July 18, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2017
  • May 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 22, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • May 20, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 12, 2017: [Discovery]
April, 2017
  • April 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • April 18, 2017: [Bond Hearing]
  • April 18, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • April 17, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • April 10, 2017: [Reconsideration]
March, 2017
  • March 15, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
February, 2017
  • February 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 21, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2017
  • January 17, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • January 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • January 13, 2017: [Discovery]
  • January 12, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
December, 2016
  • December 20, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 19, 2016: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • December 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 13, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 06, 2016: [Oral Order]
  • December 06, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • December 06, 2016: [Indictment - Superseding]
November, 2016
  • November 23, 2016: [Request]
  • November 23, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 22, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 22, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • November 22, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 22, 2016: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • November 22, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 22, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • November 22, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 22, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 21, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • November 15, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 15, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 14, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 09, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • November 09, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.