U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30157-1
  • Case Name: USA v. One Star et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 23, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 23, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 09, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 09, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 09, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 13, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • July 13, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • July 13, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 10, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 04, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • June 04, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • June 04, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 10, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
  • February 10, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • February 09, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 27, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 27, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 27, 2021: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 27, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 27, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 25, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 25, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 25, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
April, 2020
  • April 21, 2020: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 27, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 27, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 06, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2019
  • July 16, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 16, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • July 16, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • July 16, 2019: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • July 16, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 16, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 16, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • July 16, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 16, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 12, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 11, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2019
  • April 05, 2019: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • April 05, 2019: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Judgment Returned Executed]
November, 2018
  • November 15, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 14, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 05, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 02, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 02, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
October, 2018
  • October 23, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 19, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • September 19, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • September 19, 2018: [Order]
  • September 19, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 18, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 17, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • September 16, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 16, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • September 16, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 16, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 14, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2018
  • May 18, 2018: [Judgment Returned Executed]
April, 2018
  • April 05, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 02, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 02, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 23, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 12, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 21, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 21, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • February 21, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • February 21, 2018: [Order]
  • February 21, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 21, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 21, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • February 21, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 21, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 21, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • February 20, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • August 01, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 01, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • July 31, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • July 19, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 19, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 19, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 06, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 29, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • June 27, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 27, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 26, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • June 21, 2017: [Sealed Supporting Document(s)]
  • June 02, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 30, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 22, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 17, 2017: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 17, 2017: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 16, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 12, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 12, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 12, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 26, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 26, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 25, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • April 25, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • April 21, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • April 21, 2017: [Continue]
  • April 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 20, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 20, 2017: [Extend]
  • April 18, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 18, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 18, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 03, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 22, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 21, 2017: [Order]
  • March 21, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 21, 2017: [Request]
  • March 21, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 21, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • March 21, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 21, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • March 21, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • March 21, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 21, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Amended]
  • March 21, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 21, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 21, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • March 21, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 21, 2017: [Arrest]
  • March 20, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • March 20, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 20, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 20, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • March 20, 2017: [Request]
  • March 20, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 20, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2017
  • February 22, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 07, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 30, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 30, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 30, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 20, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 15, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 15, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 01, 2016: [Order]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • November 29, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 29, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • November 29, 2016: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • November 28, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 28, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • November 28, 2016: [Request]
  • November 23, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 23, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 23, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 23, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 23, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 23, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 23, 2016: [Arrest]
  • November 22, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • November 22, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 22, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 22, 2016: [Request]
  • November 22, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 22, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 09, 2016: [Indictment]
  • November 09, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.