U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30152-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Eagle Horse
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
March, 2017
  • March 01, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 01, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • February 15, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 15, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 03, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2016
  • December 20, 2016: [Order]
  • December 16, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • December 13, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 12, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 06, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 06, 2016: [Request]
  • December 02, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 02, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 02, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 02, 2016: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
November, 2016
  • November 18, 2016: [Request]
  • November 16, 2016: [Order]
  • November 16, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 16, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 10, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 10, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • November 10, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • November 10, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 10, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 10, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • November 10, 2016: [Arrest]
  • November 09, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 09, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 09, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • November 09, 2016: [Warrant Issued]
  • November 09, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • November 09, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.