U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30150-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Peters
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • March 16, 2020: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 27, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2017
  • July 06, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 06, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 06, 2017: [Sentencing]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 30, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 30, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 13, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 02, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2017
  • May 16, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2017
  • April 19, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 17, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 17, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 13, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • April 13, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • April 13, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 13, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 13, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 13, 2017: [Extend]
  • April 07, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • April 07, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • April 07, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 07, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 05, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 03, 2017: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • April 03, 2017: [Arrest]
March, 2017
  • March 20, 2017: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • March 16, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 08, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • March 08, 2017: [Transcript]
  • March 07, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • March 07, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Response]
  • February 17, 2017: [Extend]
  • February 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • February 15, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 13, 2017: [Extend]
  • February 06, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 06, 2017: [Suppress]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 27, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 27, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Order]
  • November 28, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • November 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 18, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 18, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 17, 2016: [Request]
  • November 15, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 10, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 10, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 10, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • November 09, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • November 09, 2016: [Indictment]
  • November 09, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 09, 2016: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.