U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30161-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Poorman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 11, 2020: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
June, 2018
  • June 07, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • June 07, 2018: [Transcript]
November, 2017
  • November 09, 2017: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
October, 2017
  • October 05, 2017: [Judgment of Acquittal]
  • October 05, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • October 05, 2017: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • October 05, 2017: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • October 05, 2017: [Verdict]
  • October 05, 2017: [Jury Instructions (Redacted)]
  • October 05, 2017: [Jury Instructions]
  • October 05, 2017: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • October 04, 2017: [Jury Instructions]
  • October 04, 2017: [Jury Instructions (Redacted)]
  • October 04, 2017: [Jury List]
  • October 04, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • October 03, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • October 03, 2017: [Pretrial Conference]
  • October 02, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • October 02, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Witness List]
  • September 29, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 27, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • September 27, 2017: [Witness List]
  • September 25, 2017: [Response]
  • September 25, 2017: [In Limine]
  • September 25, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • September 19, 2017: [In Limine]
August, 2017
  • August 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 02, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 02, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 01, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
July, 2017
  • July 25, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 24, 2017: [Sealed Order]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Sealed Order]
  • June 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 19, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 19, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 19, 2017: [Notice]
  • June 19, 2017: [In Limine]
  • June 07, 2017: [Notice]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Notice]
  • May 25, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 19, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 19, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • May 09, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • May 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • March 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 23, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 23, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 21, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 17, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • March 17, 2017: [Transcript]
  • March 15, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 15, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • March 15, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 15, 2017: [Bail Review Hearing]
February, 2017
  • February 21, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 08, 2017: [Response]
  • February 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 30, 2017: [Extend]
  • January 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 24, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 24, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 23, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 23, 2017: [Suppress]
December, 2016
  • December 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 12, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 12, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 05, 2016: [Order]
  • December 05, 2016: [Oral Order]
  • December 02, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 02, 2016: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • December 02, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • December 02, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Request]
  • November 28, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 23, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • November 23, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • November 23, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 23, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 23, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 23, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • November 23, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 23, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 23, 2016: [Arrest]
  • November 22, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • November 22, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 22, 2016: [Request]
  • November 22, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 22, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 22, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 09, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • November 09, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.