U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30149-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Black Moon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
March, 2020
  • March 09, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 09, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 09, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 03, 2020: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 03, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • February 24, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • February 14, 2020: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
January, 2020
  • January 08, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 26, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 26, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 26, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • December 26, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • December 26, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • December 26, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 26, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 19, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 19, 2019: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
December, 2018
  • December 06, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 03, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
May, 2017
  • May 18, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 18, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 16, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • May 11, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 03, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 03, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 03, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 19, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 07, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • April 06, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2017
  • February 21, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 21, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 21, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 17, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 14, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 14, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 14, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 09, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 09, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2016
  • December 05, 2016: [Order]
  • December 02, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • December 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Request]
  • November 29, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 29, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 16, 2016: [Request]
  • November 16, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 16, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • November 16, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 14, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 14, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 14, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 14, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • November 14, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 14, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 14, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • November 14, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 14, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • November 10, 2016: [Order]
  • November 10, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 10, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 09, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • November 09, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.