U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30160-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lara
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 12, 2023: [Text Order]
  • January 12, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 09, 2023: [Letter]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Terminate Hearings]
  • December 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • December 16, 2022: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 16, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 16, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 15, 2022: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
  • March 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 09, 2021: [Response]
  • March 09, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • March 08, 2021: [Extend]
February, 2021
  • February 05, 2021: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
January, 2021
  • January 14, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
November, 2020
  • November 05, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
April, 2020
  • April 21, 2020: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 25, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 25, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • April 25, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • April 21, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 21, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 21, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 20, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 06, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 03, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2017
  • February 14, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 14, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 13, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 09, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 09, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 09, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2017
  • January 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 13, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 13, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 25, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 23, 2016: [Request]
  • November 23, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 23, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • November 23, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 23, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 23, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 23, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • November 23, 2016: [Arrest]
  • November 22, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • November 22, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 21, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • November 18, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 18, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 09, 2016: [Indictment]
  • November 09, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.