U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30159-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Runs After
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 21, 2020: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 13, 2020: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 27, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 27, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • June 20, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 20, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 20, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 15, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • June 14, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 13, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 05, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2018
  • May 18, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • May 02, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 19, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 12, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 11, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 11, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 11, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 10, 2018: [Extend]
  • April 09, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 09, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 21, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • February 21, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 15, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • February 15, 2018: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • February 15, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
  • February 09, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 09, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 14, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 14, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • September 14, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
July, 2017
  • July 20, 2017: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • July 18, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 18, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • July 18, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • July 17, 2017: [Report of Apparent Violation of Pretrial Release Conditions]
  • July 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 03, 2017: [Order]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 29, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 28, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • June 22, 2017: [Request]
  • June 20, 2017: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • June 20, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 09, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 09, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
May, 2017
  • May 12, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 12, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • May 12, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • May 12, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • May 09, 2017: [Order]
  • May 08, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • May 04, 2017: [Order]
April, 2017
  • April 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 20, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • April 20, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • April 19, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 19, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 18, 2017: [Order]
  • April 07, 2017: [Order]
  • April 07, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 07, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 29, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • March 28, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • March 27, 2017: [Order]
  • March 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 22, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 22, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
January, 2017
  • January 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 06, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 06, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 23, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • November 23, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 22, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • November 17, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 16, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 15, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • November 15, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 15, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 15, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 15, 2016: [Arrest]
  • November 15, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • November 15, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • November 15, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 15, 2016: [Request]
  • November 15, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 15, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 15, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 09, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • November 09, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.