U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30158-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Blindman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • March 25, 2020: [Forfeiture]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Declaration of Publication]
May, 2018
  • May 08, 2018: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • May 08, 2018: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
January, 2018
  • January 19, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
December, 2017
  • December 19, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
November, 2017
  • November 01, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2017
  • October 19, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
  • October 19, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 19, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • October 19, 2017: [Forfeiture]
  • October 19, 2017: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • October 19, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • October 19, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 19, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • October 19, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 16, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 11, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 11, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 11, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 06, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 12, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • September 08, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Amended]
August, 2017
  • August 03, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • July 28, 2017: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • July 28, 2017: [Information - Misdemeanor]
  • July 27, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 27, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 27, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 06, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 06, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2017
  • June 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 05, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 05, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 25, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 25, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2017
  • March 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 06, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 06, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2017
  • January 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 09, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 09, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Request]
  • December 21, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 21, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • December 21, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 21, 2016: [Order]
  • December 21, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 21, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 21, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • December 21, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 21, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Amended]
  • December 21, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 21, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • December 21, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 21, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 20, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • December 20, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 20, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 20, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • December 20, 2016: [Request]
  • December 12, 2016: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • December 12, 2016: [Arrest - Other District]
  • December 12, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 12, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2016
  • November 09, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • November 09, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.