U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30164-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sadekni
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 21, 2020: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
March, 2020
  • March 11, 2020: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
July, 2017
  • July 24, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
  • July 20, 2017: [Order]
  • July 18, 2017: [Letter]
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • June 02, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 02, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 02, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • June 02, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 02, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • June 01, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 26, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 24, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 16, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 04, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 02, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • March 24, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 17, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 17, 2017: [Supplement]
  • March 17, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 17, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 14, 2017: [Extend]
  • March 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Letter]
  • February 16, 2017: [Reply]
  • February 10, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 02, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 31, 2017: [Oral Scheduling Order]
  • January 28, 2017: [Extend]
  • January 28, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • January 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 27, 2017: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • January 27, 2017: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • January 25, 2017: [Extend]
  • January 23, 2017: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • January 20, 2017: [Consent]
  • January 17, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 17, 2017: [Extend]
  • January 10, 2017: [Brief]
  • January 10, 2017: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Order]
  • December 28, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • December 28, 2016: [Request]
  • December 20, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 15, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 15, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 15, 2016: [Request]
  • December 14, 2016: [Request]
  • December 14, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 14, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • December 14, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 14, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 14, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 14, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 14, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • December 14, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 14, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 14, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • December 07, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • November 16, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 16, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 14, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • November 09, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • November 09, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.