U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30155-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Marks
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 10, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 09, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 09, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 11, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 17, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • May 17, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 17, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 17, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • May 17, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • May 17, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • May 10, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 08, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • May 08, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 08, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 08, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 08, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 06, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • May 06, 2019: [Warrant Issued on Revocation]
  • May 06, 2019: [Request for Warrant]
  • May 06, 2019: [Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 28, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 28, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • February 14, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 14, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 09, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 06, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • February 06, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • February 03, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2016
  • December 20, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 20, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 12, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 09, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 09, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 09, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2016
  • November 17, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 17, 2016: [Order]
  • November 16, 2016: [Request]
  • November 16, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 16, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • November 14, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 14, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • November 14, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • November 14, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 14, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 14, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • November 14, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 14, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • November 14, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 14, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • November 14, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 14, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 14, 2016: [Request]
  • November 09, 2016: [Indictment]
  • November 09, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.