U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30163-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Marso
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Order to Exclude Period of Delay]
  • February 27, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • February 27, 2017: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 27, 2017: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 27, 2017: [Agreement for Pretrial Diversion]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 24, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 24, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2016
  • December 15, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • December 14, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • December 13, 2016: [Oral Order]
  • December 09, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 05, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 05, 2016: [Order]
  • December 05, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 02, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 02, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • December 02, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • December 02, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 02, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 02, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 02, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • December 02, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 02, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 02, 2016: [Request]
November, 2016
  • November 23, 2016: [Request]
  • November 23, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 16, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 16, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 14, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • November 09, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • November 09, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.