U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30154-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LeCompte
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 24, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2017
  • January 04, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 04, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 03, 2017: [Sentencing]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 20, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 16, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 15, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 15, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 15, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2016
  • November 17, 2016: [Order]
  • November 17, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 14, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • November 14, 2016: [Request]
  • November 14, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 14, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • November 14, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 14, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • November 14, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 14, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 11, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • November 11, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 10, 2016: [Request]
  • November 10, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 10, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • November 10, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 10, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 09, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • November 09, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.