U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40124-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Morales et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 04, 2020: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
  • August 03, 2020: [Mail Returned]
July, 2020
  • July 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
  • July 10, 2020: [Mail Returned]
  • July 08, 2020: [Letter]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 30, 2020: [Letter]
  • June 29, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • June 25, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 19, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • June 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 16, 2020: [Extend]
  • June 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 11, 2020: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
  • June 11, 2020: [Extend]
  • June 11, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Transcript]
  • May 26, 2020: [Transcript]
October, 2019
  • October 07, 2019: [Appeal Record Returned]
September, 2019
  • September 16, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • August 09, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
  • August 05, 2019: [USCA Order]
June, 2019
  • June 13, 2019: [USCA Opinion]
  • June 13, 2019: [USCA Judgment]
September, 2018
  • September 18, 2018: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • September 17, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
August, 2018
  • August 24, 2018: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • August 21, 2018: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • July 17, 2018: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • July 17, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • July 17, 2018: [Transcript - Public]
  • July 17, 2018: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • July 17, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • July 17, 2018: [Transcript]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [USCA Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript]
  • June 25, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • June 25, 2018: [Transcript - Public]
  • June 25, 2018: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • June 25, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • June 25, 2018: [Transcript of Voir Dire]
  • June 25, 2018: [Transcript]
  • June 05, 2018: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • May 31, 2018: [Court Reporter Information]
  • May 30, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • May 22, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 21, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 21, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 18, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • May 18, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • May 17, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 02, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 02, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • May 02, 2018: [Sentencing]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 27, 2018: [Reply]
  • April 27, 2018: [Information - Pursuant to 21 U.S.C. 851]
  • April 26, 2018: [Leave to]
  • April 25, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 24, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 23, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 23, 2018: [Extend]
  • April 23, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 23, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 23, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 20, 2018: [Extend]
  • April 20, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 20, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • April 09, 2018: [Brief]
  • April 09, 2018: [Response]
  • April 09, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • April 04, 2018: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • April 03, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • April 03, 2018: [Transcript]
  • April 02, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [USCA Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript]
  • March 26, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • March 17, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • March 17, 2018: [Transcript - Public]
  • March 17, 2018: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • March 07, 2018: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • March 07, 2018: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • March 07, 2018: [Court Reporter Information]
  • March 06, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 27, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 26, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • February 16, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 16, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 16, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 08, 2018: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • February 08, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 08, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • February 08, 2018: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • February 08, 2018: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • February 08, 2018: [Verdict]
  • February 08, 2018: [Jury Question]
  • February 08, 2018: [Jury Instructions]
  • February 07, 2018: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • February 07, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • February 06, 2018: [Jury Instructions]
  • February 06, 2018: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • February 06, 2018: [Jury List]
  • February 02, 2018: [Pretrial Conference]
  • February 02, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 02, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 01, 2018: [Response to Motion]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Notice]
  • January 30, 2018: [In Limine]
  • January 30, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • January 28, 2018: [Jury List]
  • January 26, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 24, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 23, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 23, 2018: [In Limine]
  • January 15, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • January 03, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 03, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 03, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • January 03, 2018: [Sentencing]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 27, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 27, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 20, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 20, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 18, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • December 08, 2017: [Order]
  • December 06, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2017
  • November 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 17, 2017: [Continue]
  • November 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 06, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • November 02, 2017: [Consent]
  • November 02, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 02, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Disclosure ]
  • October 31, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 31, 2017: [In Limine]
  • October 23, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 23, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 23, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 23, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 23, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 19, 2017: [Information - Pursuant to 21 U.S.C. 851]
  • October 19, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • October 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • October 19, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 19, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 18, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 17, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 17, 2017: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 19, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 15, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 14, 2017: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • September 14, 2017: [Letter]
  • September 14, 2017: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • September 06, 2017: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 06, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 05, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • August 31, 2017: [Brief]
  • August 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 30, 2017: [Extend]
  • August 29, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 25, 2017: [Brief]
  • August 25, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 25, 2017: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • August 22, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • August 22, 2017: [Transcript]
  • August 16, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • August 16, 2017: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • August 11, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • August 09, 2017: [Redacted Document]
  • August 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 08, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 08, 2017: [Suppress]
  • August 08, 2017: [Extend]
  • August 02, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 01, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 01, 2017: [Suppress]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 27, 2017: [Continue]
May, 2017
  • May 03, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • May 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 03, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 02, 2017: [Extend]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 28, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 25, 2017: [Acquittal]
  • April 25, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 25, 2017: [Suppress]
February, 2017
  • February 16, 2017: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • February 15, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • February 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 14, 2017: [Brief]
  • February 14, 2017: [Suppress]
  • February 14, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • February 06, 2017: [Discovery]
January, 2017
  • January 29, 2017: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • January 27, 2017: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • January 26, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 26, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • January 26, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • January 26, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 26, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 26, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • January 26, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 26, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • January 26, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • January 25, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • January 23, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 23, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 23, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 23, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 20, 2017: [Oral Order]
  • January 20, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • January 20, 2017: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • January 20, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • December 29, 2016: [Bond Hearing]
  • December 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • December 29, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • December 22, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • December 09, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 08, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • December 08, 2016: [Bond Hearing]
  • December 07, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • December 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 06, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 06, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 05, 2016: [Notice]
November, 2016
  • November 23, 2016: [Response]
  • November 23, 2016: [Request]
  • November 22, 2016: [Notice]
  • November 22, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • November 22, 2016: [Discovery]
  • November 18, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 18, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • November 18, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 18, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • November 18, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 18, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 18, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • November 17, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • November 14, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 14, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 14, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 10, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 10, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 10, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 10, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.