U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:12-cr-50014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bissonette
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 02, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 02, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 16, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • October 16, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
August, 2018
  • August 06, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 02, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 02, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 02, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 23, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 20, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 20, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 20, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 20, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 20, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2018
  • April 10, 2018: [Order of Detention - DROPS]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 14, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 05, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
September, 2017
  • September 15, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 13, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 13, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • September 13, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • September 13, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 13, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 13, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 13, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 13, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
July, 2017
  • July 10, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 07, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
June, 2017
  • June 12, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 01, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
May, 2017
  • May 04, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • May 03, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 01, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • May 01, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • May 01, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 01, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 01, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 01, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 01, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 28, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • April 28, 2017: [Warrant Issued on Revocation]
  • April 28, 2017: [Order for Warrant - Probation Request]
  • April 28, 2017: [Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 28, 2017: [Request for Warrant]
  • April 14, 2017: [Order of Detention - DROPS]
February, 2017
  • February 06, 2017: [Order of Detention - DROPS]
November, 2016
  • November 14, 2016: [Order of Detention - DROPS]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.