U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-10040-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hamen
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 03, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 03, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 02, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • May 02, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • May 02, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 01, 2017: [Sealed Supporting Document(s)]
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 25, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 25, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 20, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 19, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 17, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 17, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 11, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • March 13, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 13, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 13, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 13, 2017: [Strike ]
  • March 10, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 10, 2017: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 09, 2017: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • March 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 02, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 02, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2017
  • February 07, 2017: [Order]
  • February 06, 2017: [Stipulation]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • January 24, 2017: [Response]
  • January 23, 2017: [Request]
  • January 23, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 23, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • January 23, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • January 19, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 19, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 19, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 19, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 19, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • January 18, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • January 17, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • January 10, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 09, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
November, 2016
  • November 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • November 14, 2016: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.