U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30145-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cass
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 05, 2019: [Judgment Returned Executed]
January, 2019
  • January 04, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 04, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 19, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 19, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • December 18, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 18, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 18, 2018: [Order]
  • December 18, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 18, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 18, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 18, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 18, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
August, 2018
  • August 10, 2018: [Judgment Returned Executed]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 27, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 04, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2018
  • May 17, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • May 16, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • May 16, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • May 16, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • May 16, 2018: [Order]
  • May 16, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • May 16, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 16, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 07, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 04, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • May 04, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 04, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 04, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
March, 2018
  • March 20, 2018: [Judgment Returned Executed]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 20, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 20, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 16, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 16, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 01, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
January, 2018
  • January 17, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • January 16, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 11, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • January 11, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • January 11, 2018: [Order]
  • January 11, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 11, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • January 11, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 10, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • January 10, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 10, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 03, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • January 03, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 03, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 03, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 03, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 03, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • January 03, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
March, 2017
  • March 13, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 07, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 07, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 07, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 07, 2017: [Sentencing]
February, 2017
  • February 22, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • February 21, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • February 17, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 17, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 15, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 15, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 02, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2016
  • December 13, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 13, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 07, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 05, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 05, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 05, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2016
  • November 18, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 17, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 16, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 16, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 16, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • November 16, 2016: [Request]
  • November 15, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • November 15, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 15, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 15, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 15, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
  • November 15, 2016: [Arrest]
  • November 15, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • November 15, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 15, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.