U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:11-cr-40016-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bonestroo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Mail Returned]
  • August 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2020
  • July 06, 2020: [Modify Conditions of Release]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: [Notice]
November, 2016
  • November 16, 2016: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.