U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30147-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Marshall
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Report and Recommendations on Revocation]
  • April 09, 2025: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 09, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • April 02, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • April 02, 2025: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 01, 2025: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • March 28, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 28, 2025: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 28, 2025: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 09, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 07, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 07, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 29, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 29, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 05, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 29, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 20, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 29, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • September 29, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • September 22, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 16, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • September 15, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • September 15, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 15, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • September 15, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 15, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 15, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 15, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • September 13, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • August 28, 2017: [Forfeiture]
July, 2017
  • July 19, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 18, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 18, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 17, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
  • July 17, 2017: [Sentencing]
June, 2017
  • June 23, 2017: [Declaration of Publication]
  • June 19, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 12, 2017: [Declaration of Publication]
  • June 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 06, 2017: [Continue]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 31, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 31, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 26, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 19, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 03, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • March 28, 2017: [Transcript - Public]
  • March 28, 2017: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • March 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • March 24, 2017: [Forfeiture]
  • March 24, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 22, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 21, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 13, 2017: [Report of Apparent Violation of Pretrial Release Conditions]
  • March 13, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 03, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 02, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 02, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 02, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2017
  • January 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 17, 2017: [Consent]
  • January 17, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2016
  • December 15, 2016: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • December 13, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • December 13, 2016: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • December 07, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 07, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • December 07, 2016: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • December 05, 2016: [Order]
  • December 02, 2016: [Stipulation]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 29, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • November 29, 2016: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • November 28, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • November 22, 2016: [Order]
  • November 22, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 22, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 18, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • November 17, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 16, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 16, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 16, 2016: [Request]
  • November 16, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • November 16, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • November 16, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • November 16, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 16, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 16, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • November 16, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 16, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
  • November 16, 2016: [Arrest]
  • November 16, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • November 16, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 16, 2016: [Bail Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.