U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30144-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Little Wounded
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 05, 2019: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • June 05, 2019: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
October, 2018
  • October 10, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
September, 2018
  • September 13, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
March, 2018
  • March 20, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
October, 2017
  • October 04, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 19, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 18, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
  • September 18, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • September 11, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 11, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 11, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 07, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 01, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
August, 2017
  • August 21, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 11, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • June 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Produce]
  • June 27, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 26, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 15, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 13, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 13, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 13, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 09, 2017: [Extend]
  • June 02, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 02, 2017: [Produce ]
  • June 02, 2017: [Disclosure ]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 30, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • May 30, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • May 26, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • May 26, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 26, 2017: [Revoke]
  • May 24, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2017
  • April 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 14, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 14, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2017
  • February 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 15, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 15, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2016
  • December 13, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 09, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 09, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Order]
  • November 22, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 21, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 21, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • November 16, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • November 16, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 16, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 16, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • November 16, 2016: [Request]
  • November 16, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 16, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 16, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 16, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • November 16, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 16, 2016: [Arrest]
  • November 16, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
  • November 16, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • November 16, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 16, 2016: [Bail Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.