U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50143-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Eisenbraun
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • November 04, 2021: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
March, 2020
  • March 03, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
February, 2020
  • February 07, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • February 07, 2020: [Sentencing]
July, 2019
  • July 15, 2019: [Sentencing]
March, 2019
  • March 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 05, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 24, 2018: [Continue]
  • May 24, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 24, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 24, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 24, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 23, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • April 09, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2018
  • February 05, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 02, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • February 02, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 02, 2018: [Consent]
  • February 02, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 02, 2018: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • February 01, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
January, 2018
  • January 23, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 23, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 23, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 23, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 15, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • December 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 14, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2017
  • September 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 19, 2017: [Consent]
  • September 13, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • September 13, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 22, 2017: [Consent]
  • June 19, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • June 19, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2017
  • April 04, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 04, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 30, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • March 30, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2017
  • January 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 05, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 05, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • January 05, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • December 05, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 05, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 01, 2016: [Bail Report]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • November 23, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 23, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • November 22, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 22, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • November 22, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • November 22, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 22, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 22, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 22, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • November 21, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • November 21, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 18, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 17, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 17, 2016: [Indictment]
  • November 17, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.