U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50145-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cain
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • November 01, 2018: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 14, 2017: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 11, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 06, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2017
  • March 15, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 10, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2017
  • January 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 13, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 12, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • December 08, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • December 02, 2016: [Request]
  • December 02, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 30, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • November 30, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 30, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 30, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 30, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • November 30, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 30, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 30, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 30, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 30, 2016: [Arrest]
  • November 17, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • November 17, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.