U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50142-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sierra
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 19, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 15, 2022: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 12, 2022: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • August 12, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 07, 2022: [Continue]
  • July 06, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 01, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 01, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 01, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • July 01, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 17, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 08, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 07, 2021: [Furlough]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • December 07, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 07, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 07, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 07, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 06, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
November, 2021
  • November 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • November 02, 2021: [Furlough]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 22, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 19, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • November 15, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 13, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Allocution Statement (COURT USE ONLY)]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • September 24, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 23, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 20, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 20, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • September 20, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 20, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 20, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 20, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
July, 2018
  • July 05, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 03, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 13, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • March 28, 2018: [Furlough]
  • March 19, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 19, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 16, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 16, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • March 16, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 16, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 16, 2018: [Consent]
  • March 16, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 14, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 14, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
October, 2017
  • October 16, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 16, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 13, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • October 09, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • October 09, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 05, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 05, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 05, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 27, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 27, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • September 15, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 13, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2017
  • August 16, 2017: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • August 16, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • August 14, 2017: [Order Referring Motion]
  • August 08, 2017: [Release from Custody]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 26, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • July 26, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 24, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • July 21, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 21, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 21, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 21, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 21, 2017: [Waiver]
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • June 05, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 17, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 17, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 17, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 17, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • May 10, 2017: [Furlough]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
  • April 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 17, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 13, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2017
  • March 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2017
  • January 18, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • January 18, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 03, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • December 12, 2016: [Request]
  • December 12, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 09, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 09, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • December 09, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 09, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 09, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 09, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • December 09, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 09, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • December 08, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 08, 2016: [Arrest]
  • December 08, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
November, 2016
  • November 17, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • November 17, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.