U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50141-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Reif
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 09, 2020: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order on Exhibits]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Appeal Record Returned]
  • June 06, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
April, 2019
  • April 15, 2019: [USCA Judgment]
  • April 15, 2019: [USCA Opinion]
February, 2018
  • February 12, 2018: [Transcript - Redacted]
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: [Transcript Redaction Request]
  • January 05, 2018: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • January 04, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • January 04, 2018: [Transcript - Public]
  • January 04, 2018: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • January 04, 2018: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • January 02, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • January 02, 2018: [Transcript - Public]
  • January 02, 2018: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • January 02, 2018: [Mail Returned]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • December 19, 2017: [Mail Returned]
  • December 12, 2017: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • December 12, 2017: [Court Reporter Information]
  • December 11, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Judgment - Amended]
  • November 28, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 22, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 21, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 20, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • November 20, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • November 20, 2017: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • November 17, 2017: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • November 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 17, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 15, 2017: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • November 09, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • November 09, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
October, 2017
  • October 13, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 26, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 26, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 26, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 25, 2017: [Continue]
  • September 22, 2017: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
August, 2017
  • August 11, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 11, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 11, 2017: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • August 04, 2017: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • August 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 04, 2017: [Extend]
July, 2017
  • July 21, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2017
  • June 22, 2017: [Letter(s) of Support]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 12, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 12, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 12, 2017: [Waiver]
  • May 12, 2017: [Waiver of Indictment]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
  • April 24, 2017: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • April 21, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 21, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 21, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 21, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 14, 2017: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • April 14, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • April 13, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 12, 2017: [Arrest]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 24, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 13, 2017: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Bond Hearing]
  • February 21, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 15, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • February 15, 2017: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Summons]
January, 2017
  • January 24, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • January 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 11, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 10, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2016
  • December 15, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 15, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • December 15, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • December 14, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • December 14, 2016: [Request]
  • December 14, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 14, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 14, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 14, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 14, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • December 14, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 14, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • December 14, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 12, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 12, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 08, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
November, 2016
  • November 17, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • November 17, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.