U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50138-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rowland
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [USCA Judgment]
  • March 25, 2022: [USCA Opinion]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • June 11, 2021: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • June 08, 2021: [Transcript Redaction Request]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • May 19, 2021: [Transcript - Public]
  • May 19, 2021: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • May 12, 2021: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
April, 2021
  • April 13, 2021: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • April 12, 2021: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • April 09, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • April 06, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Sealed Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • March 26, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • March 26, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • March 24, 2021: [Sealed Response to Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • March 01, 2021: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 26, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 26, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
December, 2020
  • December 08, 2020: [Continue]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Continue]
  • August 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [For Order]
  • July 17, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
June, 2020
  • June 16, 2020: [Extend]
May, 2020
  • May 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • May 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 08, 2020: [Brief]
  • May 06, 2020: [Extend]
  • May 05, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
  • April 28, 2020: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • April 27, 2020: [Extend]
  • April 24, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
  • April 24, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • April 14, 2020: [Extend]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 30, 2020: [Extend]
  • March 30, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 24, 2020: [Brief]
  • March 24, 2020: [Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • February 26, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • February 21, 2020: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • February 19, 2020: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 07, 2020: [Continue]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 27, 2020: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • January 24, 2020: [Continue]
  • January 10, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Order for Presentence Study and Report]
  • November 20, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 14, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 13, 2019: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • November 12, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 12, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 12, 2019: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 12, 2019: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 12, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 12, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • November 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • November 07, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 06, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 01, 2019: [Order]
  • November 01, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 01, 2019: [Pretrial Conference]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 28, 2019: [Notice]
  • October 25, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • October 25, 2019: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 21, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • October 21, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 16, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • October 16, 2019: [Exclude]
  • October 16, 2019: [Notice]
  • October 16, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 15, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 15, 2019: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 15, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • October 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • October 14, 2019: [Objection]
  • October 11, 2019: [In Limine]
  • October 11, 2019: [Objection]
  • October 11, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 11, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 11, 2019: [Notice]
  • October 09, 2019: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 04, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • October 03, 2019: [Notice]
  • October 02, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 02, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 02, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • October 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • October 02, 2019: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 01, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [In Limine]
  • September 26, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
August, 2019
  • August 09, 2019: [Sealed Order]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Notice]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Notice]
  • April 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 16, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 16, 2019: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
  • April 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 08, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • February 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • February 19, 2019: [Withdraw Document]
  • February 15, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • February 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • February 14, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 14, 2019: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 14, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • February 08, 2019: [Certificate]
  • February 07, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 07, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 07, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 11, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 04, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 15, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 15, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • October 22, 2018: [Furlough]
September, 2018
  • September 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 07, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 07, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 13, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 13, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 13, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2018
  • July 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 02, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 02, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2018
  • May 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 02, 2018: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 01, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • May 01, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2018
  • April 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 06, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 06, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2018
  • February 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 31, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 23, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 23, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 03, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 22, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 22, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 13, 2017: [Status Conference]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 25, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2017
  • July 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 05, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 13, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 09, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2017
  • May 18, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 20, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • March 29, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 27, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • March 16, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • March 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 07, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 07, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
February, 2017
  • February 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 07, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2016
  • December 27, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 21, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 19, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • December 05, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • December 02, 2016: [Request]
  • December 02, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 30, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 30, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • November 30, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 30, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 30, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • November 30, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 30, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 30, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • November 30, 2016: [Arrest]
  • November 30, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • November 29, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 18, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 17, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 17, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • November 17, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.