U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50144-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Twiss
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 11, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
June, 2020
  • June 17, 2020: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
May, 2020
  • May 08, 2020: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
October, 2018
  • October 12, 2018: [Passport - Return of]
September, 2018
  • September 12, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
August, 2018
  • August 15, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
June, 2018
  • June 07, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
April, 2018
  • April 03, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2018
  • March 09, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 09, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 01, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
  • March 01, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • March 01, 2018: [Sentencing]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 13, 2018: [Continue]
  • February 13, 2018: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • February 06, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 29, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 29, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • December 21, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 19, 2017: [Continue]
  • December 07, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
September, 2017
  • September 15, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 13, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 13, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 13, 2017: [Waiver]
  • September 05, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 05, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 05, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 05, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
June, 2017
  • June 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 22, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 22, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2017
  • May 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 01, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 01, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
March, 2017
  • March 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 28, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • December 28, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 27, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 13, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Request]
  • November 22, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 21, 2016: [Passport - Receipt of]
  • November 18, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 18, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 18, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 18, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • November 18, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • November 18, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 18, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 18, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 18, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 18, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • November 18, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • November 18, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 18, 2016: [Arrest]
  • November 17, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • November 17, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.