U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50140-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Villanueva de Macias
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • December 08, 2022: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
June, 2018
  • June 06, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 05, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 05, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 05, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • June 05, 2018: [Sentencing]
May, 2018
  • May 17, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
March, 2018
  • March 06, 2018: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • March 02, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • March 02, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 27, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 27, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 12, 2018: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
January, 2018
  • January 09, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
December, 2017
  • December 15, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2017
  • November 06, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 06, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 06, 2017: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 06, 2017: [Consent]
  • October 06, 2017: [Amended Plea Agreement]
  • October 06, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 05, 2017: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
September, 2017
  • September 01, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 01, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 01, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 01, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2017
  • August 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 07, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2017
  • July 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 11, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2017
  • June 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 05, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • June 05, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 18, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • May 18, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2017
  • April 18, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 13, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2017
  • February 09, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 26, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • January 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 24, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 20, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • December 29, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • December 15, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 09, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • December 09, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • December 09, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 09, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 09, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 09, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • December 09, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 09, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • December 08, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 01, 2016: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • December 01, 2016: [Arrest]
November, 2016
  • November 17, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • November 17, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.